Assembly | 05/20/2024 | referred to economic development | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1040 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4742A | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.488 |