Senate | 01/30/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2024 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.80 | ||
Senate | 12/20/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 4786A | ||
Senate | 12/20/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |