Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A6022A | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4787A | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.451 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.850 |