Assembly | 04/15/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.694 | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.525 |