Senate | 06/05/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A3335B | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1370 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 4811B | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 4811A | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |