Senate | 12/22/2023 | VETOED MEMO.135 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.817 | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | substituted for a5682a | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.636 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 4859A | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |