Senate | 12/22/2023 | VETOED MEMO.136 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.762 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | substituted for a5294 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1484 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |