Senate | 05/16/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | referred to insurance | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.878 | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 4863A | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1186 |