Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.949 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 4888A | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO SOCIAL SERVICES |