Senate | 11/10/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.623 | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.763 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | substituted for a5315a | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1486 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 4897A | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |