Senate | 06/07/2024 | RECOMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1472 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1487 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 4898A | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |