Senate | 05/20/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 4905C | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 4905B | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 4905A | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |