Senate | 06/07/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4909B | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 04/19/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.833 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 4909A | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.688 |