Senate | 06/07/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A1303A | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4924A | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.211 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |