Senate | 12/08/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.705 | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.814 | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | substituted for a5136 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1373 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |