Senate | 05/23/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A5008A | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.906 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 4975A | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |