Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A6244C | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1131 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 4993C | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 4993B | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 4993A |