Assembly | 03/18/2024 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5007B | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.485 | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1097 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5007A | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |