Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.506 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5015A | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1312 |