Senate | 06/04/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A5265A | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1567 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5019B | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5019A | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.557 |