Senate | 03/29/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A1771A | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.503 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |