Senate | 11/21/2023 | APPROVAL MEMO.35 | ||
Senate | 11/21/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.678 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.711 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | substituted for a6040 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1031 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | REFERRED TO LABOR |