Senate | 12/22/2023 | VETOED MEMO.137 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.867 | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | substituted for a5286a | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5056A | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | referred to banks | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1098 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |