Senate | 11/17/2023 | VETOED MEMO.79 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.394 | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | substituted for a6960 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2023 | referred to mental health | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.560 |