Senate | 04/03/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A4066B | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.459 | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5085C | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5085B | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5085A |