Senate | 05/30/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A4921C | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.941 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5107C | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5107B | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to judiciary | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5107A | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.645 |