Senate | 10/09/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5117A | ||
Senate | 10/09/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.644 |