Senate | 06/09/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A1721B | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1845 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5120B | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5120A | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |