Senate | 09/29/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.517 | ||
Senate | 09/19/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.321 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | substituted for a1077a | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | referred to transportation | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5129A | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.729 |