Senate | 05/30/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A4674A | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1024 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CITIES 2 | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1281 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5159A | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES 2 |