Senate | 11/26/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.545 | ||
Senate | 11/15/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.499 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | substituted for a8849 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.650 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.869 |