Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5329E | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.919 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5329D | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5329C | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5329B | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1375 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5329A |