Assembly | 04/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.667 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE USE DISORDERS | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1496 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |