Senate | 11/08/2023 | APPROVAL MEMO.17 | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.608 | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.359 | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | substituted for a5627 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.526 |