Senate | 12/22/2023 | APPROVAL MEMO.86 | ||
Senate | 12/22/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.765 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.728 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | substituted for a6972 | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.736 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |