Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.548 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CODES | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1747 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5448A | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |