Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1171 | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5472A | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH |