Assembly | 05/30/2024 | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.614 | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5485B | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5485A | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.647 |