Senate | 05/23/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A3233A | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.913 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5501A | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |