Senate | 12/19/2023 | APPROVAL MEMO.56 | ||
Senate | 12/19/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.730 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.168 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | substituted for a6115 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.623 |