Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.605 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5517A | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |