LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S05528
Action History
NY
New York Senate Bill S05528
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill S05528
Action History
Senate
06/07/2024
COMMITTED TO RULES
Senate
02/07/2024
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Senate
02/06/2024
2ND REPORT CAL.
Senate
02/05/2024
1ST REPORT CAL.333
Senate
01/03/2024
REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Senate
04/25/2023
1ST REPORT CAL.700