Senate | 07/28/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.239 | ||
Senate | 07/21/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.641 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | substituted for a6307a | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.914 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5535A | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |