Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5536B | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.920 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 5536A | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | RECOMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1376 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |