Senate | 06/29/2023 | DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.682 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | substituted for a2452 | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | referred to environmental conservation | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1243 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |