Senate | 05/06/2024 | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | referred to racing and wagering | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.755 |