Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.628 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.780 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5553A | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |