Assembly | 04/04/2024 | referred to local governments | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.240 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1293 |