Senate | 12/22/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.766 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.788 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | substituted for a5646a | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | referred to insurance | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1502 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 5591A | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |