Senate | 03/11/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2024 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.434 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2023 | referred to consumer affairs and protection | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.616 |